Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter 161
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Martinez made a motion to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1188.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (23-35-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Assigned to House COM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|