Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1188 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 1, 2023