Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |