LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1244
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1244
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1244
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 24, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 14, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 4, 2023
Analysis
March 31, 2023
Analysis
March 23, 2023
Analysis
February 17, 2023
Analysis
February 13, 2023