03/03/2023 | Governor Vetoed | |||
02/27/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | |||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-18-0-0) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |