Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023