House
|
05/15/2023
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (20-38-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Committee action: do pass amended on reconsideration, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House HHS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-2-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|