Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023