Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1273 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023