House | 03/30/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-2-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |