LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1304
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1304
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1304
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
April 13, 2023
Bill
January 26, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 28, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
March 30, 2023
Analysis
March 29, 2023
Analysis
March 28, 2023
Analysis
February 17, 2023
Analysis
February 15, 2023