03/09/2023 | Governor Vetoed | |||
03/06/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | |||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |