Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1305 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023