House
|
03/29/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-1-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|