Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1311 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023