House
|
05/15/2023
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House TI Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Assigned to Senate TAT Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|