Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023