Senate | 05/15/2023 | Senate motion to reconsider third reading | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Borrelli moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return Senate Bill 1324, which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representative on March 28, 2023 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried. May 9, 2023 the House returned SB 1324. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |