Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023