House
|
03/30/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to House WM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|