Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023