Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Chapter 198
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (24-4-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|