Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023