Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |