Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023