Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023