Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 12, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023