Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1603 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023