|
06/20/2023
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (36-22-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1658 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (43-15-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House TI Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|