Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023