Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1713 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023