Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1717 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023