|
05/30/2023
|
Transmitted to Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Prefile
|
|
|