Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill June 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis January 13, 2023