House
|
03/29/2023
|
House MOE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to House MOE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to House GOV Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2023
|
Prefile
|
|
|