Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis January 19, 2023