Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Prefile
|
|
|