Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note February 8, 2024
Bill December 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024