Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024