Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Chapter 92
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-5-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to Senate FICO Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (44-12-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (19-41-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House COM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|