Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Chapter 192
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (33-18-9-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Biasiucci Motion that the House rescind it action whereby it concurred in the Senate amendments to HB2325 and passed on Final Reading of Bills.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (37-20-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-12-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Conference adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Conference caucus date
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Conference caucus date
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Conference report: That the House accept the Conference Committee amendments to the Senate engrossed measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Conference members: HOFFMAN, BOLICK, FERNANDEZ
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Conference appointed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference members: PAYNE, MARTINEZ, HERNANDEZ L
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference appointed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (35-21-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|