LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2325
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2325
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2024 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2325
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 10, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 1, 2024
Compare
Bill
April 2, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 22, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
July 10, 2024
Analysis
May 14, 2024
Analysis
April 23, 2024
Analysis
April 17, 2024
Analysis
April 2, 2024
Analysis
March 18, 2024
Analysis
March 12, 2024
Analysis
February 21, 2024
Analysis
February 9, 2024
Analysis
February 1, 2024
Chaptered
Bill
May 22, 2024
Compare