House | 02/29/2024 | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2439. Passed by vv. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House motion to reconsider third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House third reading FAILED voting: (16-41-2-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-1-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House LARA Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |