Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024