House | 03/04/2024 | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to House RA Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |