Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2470 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 1, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024