03/18/2024 | Governor Vetoed | |||
03/12/2024 | Transmitted to Governor | |||
House | 03/06/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2570 substituted for SB 1112. Motion carried. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-26-0-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House majority caucus: Do not pass | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House COM Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |