Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024