Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-14-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Assigned to Senate GOV Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (46-11-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House GOV Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|