Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 8, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024